Case Information: 13-CM-0265 | |||
Short Caption: | BILAL OMAR SHARIF V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Sexual Solicitation |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CMD19580-12 | Filed Date: | 03/12/2013 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 03/12/2013 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 06/07/2013 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 10/30/2013 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Bilal O. Sharif | Y | Pro Se | N | ||||||||
Appellee | United States |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
03/12/2013 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
03/20/2013 | Filed | Initial Order | ||
03/20/2013 | Filed | Appointing Counsel/CJA Andrew Murnane, Esquire (Appellant) | ||
04/19/2013 | Filed | Statement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) (rt ordered/needed)de | ||
06/07/2013 | Filed | Supplemental Record specify - #1 (4 pgs/tape) 2/25/13 proc. | ||
06/07/2013 | Filed | Supplemental Record specify - #2 (53 pgs/tape) 3/12/13 proc. w/cd | ||
06/07/2013 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
06/11/2013 | Filed | Record Copies | ||
06/11/2013 | Filed | Record Index | ||
06/26/2013 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
08/01/2013 | Filed | Brief (Appellant) | ||
08/01/2013 | Filed | Appendix (attached to brief) (Appellant) | ||
08/28/2013 | Filed | Motion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee) | Granted | |
09/03/2013 | Filed | TMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE | ||
10/07/2013 | Filed | Order Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance | ||
10/07/2013 | Filed | Affirmed | ||
10/18/2013 | Filed | Qualls Letter Filed (Appellant) | ||
10/30/2013 | Filed | Mandate |