judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONALD O. DOUGLAS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0283
Short Caption:RONALD O. DOUGLAS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM2405-10Filed Date:03/02/2011

Opening Event Date:03/02/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/01/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/07/2012
Argued/Submitted:10/23/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/27/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRonald O. Douglas YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Uma M. AmuluruYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/02/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/22/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that R. Michael LaBelle, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
03/22/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) R. Michael LaBelle, Esquire
04/06/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
06/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (119pgs/Swaringer) 2/7/11 proc.
06/01/2011FiledRecord Completed
06/07/2011RECORD INDEX
06/07/2011RECORD COPIES
10/19/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/29/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/14/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until February 9, 2012
02/09/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/23/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before March 12, 2012
03/12/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
03/12/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
04/09/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File until May 10,2012 Brief (Appellee)Granted
04/30/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief on or before May 10, 2012
05/07/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
05/07/2012FiledBriefing Completed
06/26/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
08/27/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/23/2012FiledSubmitted To Judges Washington,Beckwith,Thompson
03/05/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, and Thompson, and Beckwith, Associate.)
03/27/2013FiledMandate
03/29/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)