judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HILL (PAUL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33586
Short Caption:HILL (PAUL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C98554Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/11/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00137
02/03/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: fn1 [We consolidate these cases for disposition.] "ORDER these appeals dismissed." Nos. 33586, 33587. SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-00734
03/02/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-01431
03/02/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/12/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 9, 1999. 99-01431