judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FRANK RODRIGUEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0003)
Case Number:S-10-0003Case Docketed On:01/06/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:FRANK RODRIGUEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:FRANK RODRIGUEZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFrank RodriguezMichael H. Reese
Patricia Lynn Bennett
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law - Federal, Criminal Law -Counsel, Evidence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 170
Citation:245 P.3d 818

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/06/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/06/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/06/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/18/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/18/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/19/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/09/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of the Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/19/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/11/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts & Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/11/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/23/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/15/2010Motion - Withdrawal of recordMotionWithdrawal of recordFinal
07/16/2010Event - Hardcopy received - motion to withdraw record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/16/2010Order - Grant - Withdrawal of record.OrderGrantFinal
07/16/2010Record - Other - Record picked up by Public Defender's OfficeRecordOtherFinal
07/30/2010Notice-Incoming - Special appointment for Graham Smith to appear on behalf of the State of WyomingNotice-IncomingAttorney substitutionFinal
08/02/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith, Special Assistant Attorney General for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/02/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Designation of Special Assistant Attorney General for Limited PurposeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/06/2010Record - Other - Record returned by the Public Defender's OfficeRecordOtherFinal
08/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Patricia L. Bennett for appellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
08/12/2010Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
08/13/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw; and received copy of proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/13/2010Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel - Public Defender granted leave to withdrawOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
08/17/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Patricia Bennett for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Special Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/17/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/23/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/10/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/10/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/12/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/11/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal