judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ESCOBAR (CARLOS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33570
Short Caption:ESCOBAR (CARLOS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33186
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C147772Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/02/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/07/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/07/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00075
01/25/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00508
03/11/1999MotionFiled Motion. 99-01742
03/15/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 9/23/98, 9/24/98, 9/25/98, 9/28/98, 9/29/98, 9/30/98. Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson. 99-01859
05/03/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We deny the motion to withdraw as counsel of record for appellant. We amend the briefing schedule for this appeal. Appellant shall, within 90 days from the date of this order, serve and file the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-03500
05/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of this order, file and serve the transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request. On March 15, 1999, court reporter Cathy Nelson filed the transcript of proceedings held on September 23, 1998, through September 30, 1998. 99-03630
05/17/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 01/08/98; 06/09/98; 06/22/98; 07/02/98; 07/17/98; 07/29/98; 07/31/98; 08/04/98; 09/01/98; 09/16/98; 09/22/98; and 09/23/98; Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson & Debra Winn. 99-03987
05/17/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request for Transcripts for 06/09/98; 06/22/98; 07/02/98; 09/16/98; 09/22/98; and 09/23/98 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson & Debra Winn. 99-03990
07/01/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. September 8, 1998 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson. 99-05780
07/01/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. June 22, 1998 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Debra Winn. 99-05781
07/01/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. July 2, 1998 and July 31, 1998 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Jeri Anderson. 99-05782
09/13/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-08607
09/13/1999BriefReceived Opening Brief. 99-08608
09/13/1999AppendixReceived Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 5. 99-08609
10/07/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The opening brief and appendix provisionally submitted on September 13, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. Respondent shall, within 30 days of the date of this order, file and serve the answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-09669
10/07/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express mail-no postmark. 99-08608
10/07/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 5. 99-08609
10/28/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No Postmark. 99-10576
11/23/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 27, 1999. 99-11695
12/28/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express-No Postmark. 99-13272
05/02/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-07162
05/02/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-14023
09/06/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14130
09/06/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-14130