judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FLOYD STRICKLAND v. EDDIE WILSON, Warden, Wyoming State Penitentiary

Case Heading (S-09-0248)
Case Number:S-09-0248Case Docketed On:12/02/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Habeas Corpus
Short Title:FLOYD STRICKLAND v. EDDIE WILSON, Warden, Wyoming State Penitentiary
Full Title:FLOYD STRICKLAND, Petitioner, v. EDDIE WILSON, Warden, Wyoming State Penitentiary, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerFloyd Strickland Pro Se
RespondentEddie WilsonBruce A. Salzburg
David L. Delicath
RespondentDepartment of CorrectionsBruce A. Salzburg
David L. Delicath
RespondentThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/02/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/02/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/02/2009Petition - Writ - habeas corpusPetitionWrit - habeas corpusFinal
12/02/2009Affidavit - Other -Floyd Strickland in Support of Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas CorpusAffidavitOtherFinal
12/10/2009Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
12/11/2009Motion - Dismiss - involuntary Petition for Writ of Habeas CorpusMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
12/16/2009Response/Objection - Motion to DismissResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
12/22/2009Order - Petition for review - denyOrderPetition for review - denyFinal
12/22/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal