judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SARAH GUARIN V. OFFICE OF EMPLOYEE APPEALS, ET AL

Case Information: 11-CV-0267
Short Caption:SARAH GUARIN V. OFFICE OF EMPLOYEE APPEALS, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB8004-10Filed Date:02/27/2011

Opening Event Date:02/27/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/11/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/21/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSarah Guarin N
E. Scott FrisonYN
AppelleeDistrict of Columbia Office of Employee AppealsN
Sheila G. BarfieldNY
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
Holly M. JohnsonNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/27/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/11/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 27, 2011, and it appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non- appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b) (3) (A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (JAC) elp
03/31/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 1/28/11) (elp)
05/04/2011RECEIVED copy of a request for transcript of the proceedings held on 1/28/11.
06/24/2011 It appearing that appellant has been notified by the Court Reporting Divsion of the Superior Court that the transcripts required for this appeal have been prepared and are ready for transmittal to this court, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order make the necessary arrangements to have the transcripts transmitted to this court, it is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall file a statement with this court, within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, that the arrangements have been made for the transmittal of the transcripts. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
07/07/2011FiledAPPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for Leave to File Status Statement Regarding Transcripts
07/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (9-pgs/tape 1/28/11 proc.)w/cd
07/11/2011FiledRecord Index
07/11/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/21/2011FiledOrder Granting APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for Leave to File Status Statement Regarding Transcripts and DIRECTING APPELLANT'S BRIEF AND THE APPENDIX
07/21/2011FiledAppellant's Status Statement Regarding Transcript
08/09/2011FiledReceived Returned mail of the 6/24/11, mailed to appellee's attorney Sheila G. Barfield, Esquire, at Office of Employee Appeals 717 14th Street, NW, 3rd Floor, Washington, DC 20005, and returned by the U.S. Postal Office as "undeliverable" and remailed to include the correct zip code of 2004, this date. Our records updated to reflect the correct zip code this date. elp (Appellee District of Columbia Office of Employee Appeals)
08/31/2011FiledOrder directing appellant to submit the brief and the appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time within 20 days
09/20/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/05/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Brief (Appellant)
10/05/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
10/05/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
10/18/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee District of Columbia)Granted
10/20/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE/MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL//OPPOS
11/22/2011FiledMotion For Summary Reversal w/Memorandum in Support (Appellant)Denied
11/22/2011LodgedReply Brief (Appellant)
12/05/2011FiledOpposition to aplt's motion for summary reversal (Appellee District of Columbia)
01/30/2012FiledORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL AND GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
01/30/2012FiledAffirmed
02/21/2012FiledMandate