judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CITY OF SANTA BARBARA VS. 8TH JUD DIST CT

Case Information: 33577
Short Caption:CITY OF SANTA BARBARA VS. 8TH JUD DIST CTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A383381Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/08/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Dickerson Dickerson Consul & Pocker--check no. 006542.
01/08/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition. Petition for Issuance of Writ of Prohibition. 99-00122
01/08/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Petitioner's Appendix, Vols. 1 and 2. 99-00123
01/11/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Proof of service on the respondent district judge and proof of service on all parties to the action in the trial court. Due Date: 10 days. 99-00149
01/25/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Letter mailed to Dickerson firm in response to letter received on 01/15/99 (cc: district judge and counsel). 99-00505
01/26/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. 99-00549
02/18/1999Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Real Party in Interest, Perry J. Genovese's Answer to Petitioner City of Santa Barbara's Petition for Issuance of Writ of Prohibition. 99-01102
02/18/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Real Party in Interest, Perry J. Genovese's Appendix. 99-01103
02/23/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing. 99-01222
03/08/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Expedite Review of Writ of Prohibition filed by Defendant City. 99-01609
03/12/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. 99-01785
04/13/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Judgment: " . . . we deny the petition." fn1 We deny real party in interest's motion to expedite review as moot in light of this disposition. 99-02802
05/11/1999RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 99-03768
05/11/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.