judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0245
94-0245
03/15/1994
Granted application that originated as 130(d) mo.
VIRGINIA INDONESIA COMPANY
HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT and HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/13/1995Motion for RehearingRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedRecord in Clerk's office
12/20/1994Supplemental Brief filedRespondentFILED - M/L/F GRANTED
12/16/1994Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
12/14/1994Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
06/23/1994Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)on behalf of Institute of Property Taxation by Edward Kliewer, III, 112 E. Pecan St., Ste 1100, San Antonio, 78205, 210/226-3116
06/08/1994Reply to ResponseRespondent
05/11/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/26/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive mandate date.
06/20/1996Notice of Appeal from the U. S. Supreme Courtwrit of certiorari denied 06-17-96
04/03/1996Notice of Appeal from the U. S. Supreme CourtWrit of Certiorari filed 03-22-96: USSC# 95-1528, October Term, 1995
01/26/1996Mandate issued
12/22/1995Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled910 SW2d 905
11/13/1995Motion for RehearingRecord in Clerk's office
11/13/1995Motion for Rehearing forwardedRecord in Clerk's office
10/27/1995Dissenting opinion issued.Dissenting opinion by Justice Hecht, joined by Justice Owen.
10/27/1995Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment affirmed in part, reversed in partJud of CA is reversed and jud is rendered. Opin by JC, joined by TRP, RAG, JH CTE, RS, JAB. Dis by NLH, joined ny PRO. 910 SW2D 905
10/27/1995Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment affirmed in part, reversed in partJud of CA is reversed and jud is rendered. Opin by JC, joined by TRP, RAG, JH CTE, RS, JAB. Dis by NLH, joined ny PRO. 910 SW2D 905
12/20/1994Motion for leave to file supplemental brief disp.Filing grantedBEHALF/RESPONDENTS
12/20/1994Supplemental Brief filedFILED - M/L/F GRANTED
12/16/1994Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filed
12/16/1994Supplemental Brief filed
12/15/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submission info.
12/15/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submitted date.
12/15/1994Oral argument argued for petitioner by J. Randolph Burton for respondents by Kenneth Wall
12/14/1994Supplemental Brief filed
12/12/1994Notice requesting filing fee$5 Pet's supplemental brief call made to office gb
12/02/1994Notice requesting filing fee$10 for M/L/F Supp Br. & $5 for Supp Br. to Kenneth Wall
09/08/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
09/08/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
09/08/1994Amount of time allotted for oral argument.20-20 minutes to argue
09/08/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling granted
09/08/1994Set for Submissionto be argued 15 December 1994
09/08/1994Writ of error issued to Court of Appeals.Granted on points 1, 2 & 3
06/23/1994Amicus Curiae Brief receivedon behalf of Institute of Property Taxation by Edward Kliewer, III, 112 E. Pecan St., Ste 1100, San Antonio, 78205, 210/226-3116
06/08/1994Reply to Response
05/26/1994Case forwarded to Court
05/11/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/18/1994APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILEDM/E/T granted app due 05-04-94
03/18/1994Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling grantedM/E/T granted app due 05-04-94
03/15/1994Extension of time to file app writ err filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/26/1996Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
VIRGINIA INDONESIA COMPANYPetitionerMr. J. Randolph Burton
HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DIST.RespondentMr. Kenneth E. Wall Jr.
HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL REVIEWRespondentMr. Kenneth E. Wall Jr.
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed & Remanded
871 SW2d 864, 02-10-94
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
333rd District Court
Harris
Honorable Richard P. Bianchi
91-59779