judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-94-00134-CR
13-94-00134-CR
03/15/1994
Capital Murder
Serrato, Ignacio, Jr., a/k/a Nick Serrato
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/01/1996Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk
06/12/1996Mandate Issued
06/11/1996Record returned
05/22/1996Higher Court DecisionRefused
05/06/1996Court of Crim. Appeals Number
04/26/1996Petition for Discretionary Review sent to S.Ct.
04/11/1996Petition for Review
03/11/1996Motion for Extension of Time DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/08/1996Affidavit Filed
02/08/1996Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
01/22/1996Motion Filed
01/22/1996Motion for rehearing filed
01/04/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/09/1995Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/17/1995Response to _____________.
10/10/1995Miscellaneous Motion
09/14/1995Submitted
09/14/1995Submission
09/13/1995Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/13/1995Order Entered
09/12/1995Motion to Reset submission
08/02/1995Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
07/26/1995Submission
05/18/1995Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/09/1995Response to _____________.
05/01/1995Motion Filed
03/15/1995Brief Filed
03/15/1995No oral argument requested
03/09/1995Motion for leave to file brief DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
03/08/1995Response to _____________.
03/01/1995Response to _____________.
02/27/1995Motion for leave to file brief
02/21/1995Brief Filed
02/21/1995Case ready to be set
02/21/1995Brief received.
02/21/1995Oral argument requested
02/17/1995Letter filed
01/30/1995Green card in
01/26/1995Order Entered
01/26/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/12/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/01/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/18/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/06/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/20/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/14/1994Green card in
09/09/199410 day letter sent
08/04/1994Exhibits Filed
08/04/1994Statement of Facts Filed
08/04/1994Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
08/04/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/01/1994Sworn Statement filed
06/23/1994Addtl copies of the motion for exten of time SOF
06/22/1994request for documents
06/22/1994Green card in
06/20/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/20/199410 day letter sent
06/13/1994Transcript Filed
03/15/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/15/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/12/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasRobert H. Moore, Jr.
Hon. Luis V. Saenz
Serrato, Ignacio Jr., A/k/a NAppellantHon. Larry Warner
Trial Court Information
103rd District Court
Cameron
Honorable Menton Murray
93-CR-1118-D
Life in TDCJ-ID