judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0243
94-0243
03/15/1994
App Writ of Error
CIGNA INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS
SYLVIA L. PALACIOS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/05/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
03/30/1994Reply to ResponseRespondent
03/15/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/05/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/24/1994list missing briefs when case is separated(remarksall copies of change of address filed 04-25-94
05/24/1994Record returned to Court of AppealsNo Mo/Re filed
04/25/1994Notice from Counsel of a change in addressfor William J. Collins, III
04/20/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
03/31/1994Case forwarded to Court
03/30/1994Reply to Response
03/15/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/24/1994Case StoredCase stored.No Mo/Re filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
CIGNA INSURANCE COMPANY OF TXPetitionerMr. Benjamin N. Roeder
Mr. William J. Collins III
PALACIOS, SYLVIA L.RespondentMr. Charles F. Browning
Mr. Christopher Bradshaw-Hull
Court of Appeals Information:
01-93-00079-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 11-24-93
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable D. Camille Hutson-Dunn
Trial Court Information
11th District Court
Harris
Honorable Mark D. Davidson
91-15198