judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-94-00065-CR
06-94-00065-CR
03/15/1994
Assault or Attempted Murder
Taylor, Victor
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1994Mandate Issued
08/29/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/26/1994Case ready to be set
08/26/1994Submitted
08/26/1994Submission
08/08/1994No Statement of Facts has been filed
06/22/1994No Statement of Facts has been filed
03/21/1994Transcript Filed
03/15/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/11/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/20/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Taylor, VIctorAppellantHon. Aalon W. Ferguson
Trial Court Information
76th District Court
Titus
Honorable B. D. Moye
12,059
10 Yrs. Probation