judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0239
94-0239
03/15/1994
App Writ of Error
SPICEWOOD DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION
TEXAS WATER COMMISSION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
03/29/1994Reply to ResponseRespondent
03/15/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/1994Record returned to Court of AppealsNo Mo/Re filed
04/28/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
03/31/1994Case forwarded to Court
03/29/1994Reply to Response
03/15/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/31/1994Case StoredCase stored.No Mo/Re filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
TEXAS WATER COMMISSIONRespondentMs. Mary A. Keeney
Mr. Dan Morales
SPICEWOOD NEIGHBORHOOD GROUPOther interested party Mr. Roy Gafford
SPICEWOOD DEVELOPMENT CORP.PetitionerMr. Skip Newsom
Ms. Jan Combs
Court of Appeals Information:
03-92-00375-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 11-03-93
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
331st District Court
Travis
Honorable W. Jeanne Meurer
91-1797