judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY MONTE MOTEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1566
Short Caption:ANTHONY MONTE MOTEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM1992-10Filed Date:12/13/2010

Opening Event Date:12/13/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/09/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/11/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/12/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/15/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony Monte Moten Y
T. Gail Maddox-LevineYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/13/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/03/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that T. Gail Maddox-Levine, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
01/03/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Gail Maddox-Levine, Esquire
01/13/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
02/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (120pgs/Tape) 12/8/10 proc.
02/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (61pgs/Tape) 12/9/10 proc. w/CD
02/09/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/14/2011RECORD INDEX
02/14/2011RECORD COPIES
02/24/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/23/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/23/2011APPENDIX
04/18/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 5/11/11. no oppo
05/03/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before May 11, 2011. (By: JAC)
05/11/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/11/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/27/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/12/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Ruiz, Nebeker
11/23/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Ruiz, Associate Judge, Retired, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
12/15/2011FiledMandate