judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00147-CR
04-94-00147-CR
03/15/1994
Habeas Corpus
Smithwick, Frances
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/15/2014Letter issued by the court
08/19/1994Mandate received by the trial court
08/17/1994Mandate Issued
08/17/1994Mandate Issued
07/26/1994Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
06/30/1994Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
06/30/1994Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
06/13/1994Submitted
06/13/1994Submission
06/13/1994Submitted
06/10/1994Mot. EOT To File Supp Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/07/1994Exhibits received
06/07/1994Supplemental Brief Received
06/02/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/02/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/24/1994Mot. EOT to File Supp Brief Filed
05/17/1994Submission
05/09/1994Waives Oral Argument
05/06/1994Waives Oral Argument
05/05/1994Brief Filed
05/05/1994Case ready to be set
05/05/1994Case ready to be set
04/29/1994Motion to Consolidate Cases DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/29/1994Motion to Consolidate Cases DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/11/1994Response to Motion Filed
04/08/1994No Description Available.
04/08/1994No Description Available.
03/28/1994Order Entered
03/18/1994Brief Filed
03/18/1994Motion to Consolidated Cases Filed
03/18/1994Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
03/15/1994No Description Available.
03/15/1994No Description Available.
03/15/1994No Description Available.
03/15/1994No Description Available.
03/15/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/10/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/10/1994Order Entered
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/17/1994Case StoredCase stored
08/17/2019RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasJoe Frank Garza
Tamara L. Cochran-may
Smithwick, Frances Criminal - AppellantFrances Smithwick
Douglas Tinker
Trial Court Information
79th Judicial District Court
Jim Wells
Honorable Terry A. Canales
94-02-8632