judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00139-CV
03-94-00139-CV
03/15/1994
Mandamus
The Dallas Morning News
The Honorable Robert Jones
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/25/2003Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/23/1996CASE STORED
04/21/1994Motion for leave to file writ of mandamus disposedOverruled
04/21/1994Order EnteredOverruled
04/14/1994Motion for extension to file reply disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/14/1994Reply filed
04/04/1994Motion for extension to file reply filed
04/04/1994Response received
04/01/1994Letter received
04/01/1994to a filing
03/31/1994Response to Motion
03/28/1994Response to Motion
03/23/1994to a filing
03/16/1994Response requested (postcard)
03/15/1994Motion for leave to file writ of mandamus, etc. fi
03/15/1994Petition for Writ of Mandamus rec'd
03/15/1994Statement of Facts Received
03/15/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/21/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Cook, Kerry MaxReal party in interestMr. Paul Nugent
Dallas Morning News, TheRelatorMr. Paul C. Watler
Mr. D. Randall Johnson
State Of TexasReal party in interestMs. Amy R. Blalock
The Honorable David E. Dobbs
Jones, RobertRespondentThe Honorable Bob Jones
Trial Court Information
26th District Court
Williamson
Honorable John K. Dietz
1-77-179