judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO JONES

Case Information: 36357
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO JONESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D247969Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/13/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/29/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robert J. Kossack, Esq.--check no. 4624.
06/29/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 00-11082
07/07/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: June 12, 2000. To Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper. 00-11616
07/13/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-12055
08/07/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 6/12/00. Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper. 00-13614
09/21/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 9/19/00. 00-16683
09/21/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-16684
09/29/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Interdepartmental Mail. 00-17227
09/29/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-17228
10/17/2000BriefFiled Joinder to Brief. Seth Messiah Shepard Jones and David Shepard Jones Joinder in the Respondent's Answering Brief. 00-18372
10/26/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-18964
10/26/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Corrected certificate of service to appellant's reply brief. 00-18970
10/31/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The motion filed Octobet 26, 2000, is granted. Appellant's reply brief provisionally submitted on October 19, 2000, shall be filed, forthwith. 00-19131
10/31/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. 00-18530
03/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-04504
03/13/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP01A-CY/ML/NB
04/06/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-05901
05/02/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-06072
05/02/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 9, 2001. 01-06072