judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DOROTHY ANN TAYLOR and THOMAS MICHAEL BUNDREN, Co-Administrators of the Estate of Thomas Beason Bundren v. FSQ, INC., f/k/a FIVE STAR QUALITY CARE, INC., a foreign for-profit corporation doing business under the trade name of WORLAND HEALTHCARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER

Case Heading (S-09-0043)
Case Number:S-09-0043Case Docketed On:03/04/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Washakie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:DOROTHY ANN TAYLOR and THOMAS MICHAEL BUNDREN, Co-Administrators of the Estate of Thomas Beason Bundren v. FSQ, INC., f/k/a FIVE STAR QUALITY CARE, INC., a foreign for-profit corporation doing business under the trade name of WORLAND HEALTHCARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER
Full Title:DOROTHY ANN TAYLOR and THOMAS MICHAEL BUNDREN, Co-Administrators of the Estate of Thomas Beason Bundren, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. FSQ, INC., f/k/a FIVE STAR QUALITY CARE, INC., a foreign for-profit corporation doing business under the trade name of WORLAND HEALTHCARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDorothy Ann TaylorLaurence W. Stinson
AppellantThomas Michael BundrenLaurence W. Stinson
AppelleeFSQ, Inc.Gary R. Scott
AppelleeWorland Healthcare and Rehabilitation CenterGary R. Scott

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/04/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/04/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
03/04/2009Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
03/04/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/04/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - Other - Notice of E-filing requirements.Notice-OutgoingOtherFinal
03/20/2009Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
04/21/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/23/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Opening BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/24/2009Service - Certificate of service (Amended)ServiceCertificate of serviceFinal
04/27/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Amended Certificate of Service for Appellants' Opening BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/27/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppellantsNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
05/28/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/29/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's motion for extension of time to file brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/29/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/17/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/29/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/08/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, seven volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volumes IV-VI, Transcripts; Volume VII, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/08/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Laurence Stinson for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/17/2009Event - Phone Call - received call from counsel for appellant indicating that the case may settle, and will file a motion to vacate oral argument.EventPhone CallFinal
07/29/2009Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
07/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' motion to vacate oral argument.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/30/2009Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
08/28/2009System - Status check - other. Contacted counsel for appellant regarding status of settlement. Assistant indicated that the agreement is before the district court judge for approval.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
09/30/2009System - Status check - other. Contacted counsel for appellant who indicated that they just got an order from district court on Monday, and will be filing a motion for voluntary dismissal this week.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
10/01/2009Motion - Dismiss - stipulatedMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
10/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion to Dismiss AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/27/2009Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
10/27/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/27/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/02/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/28/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal