judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00408-CV
05-94-00408-CV
03/15/1994
Other Personal Injury
Bell, Savannah
Showa Denko K. K., et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/04/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
04/04/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
03/21/1994Statement of Facts Filed
03/15/1994Transcript Filed
03/15/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/14/1994Appeal Bond Filed
11/15/1993Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/07/1992Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
193rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
92-11309-L