judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-2505
B-2505
01/14/1971
Application for Writ of Error
FLETCHER RABB, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA VAPO GAS AND APPLIANCE COMPANY AND LEX TREXLER
HAZEL VEONY COLEMAN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF ALLEN SCOUT COLEMAN, A MINOR, AND AS COMMUNITY SURVIVOR OF MIKE COLEMAN, DECEASED
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/21/1971Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/18/1971Response to Brief filedPetitioner
05/07/1971Post submission brief filedRespondent
01/29/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
01/14/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/10/1971Letter Filed
07/23/1971Response to Motion filed
07/21/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/07/1971Dissenting opinion issued.
07/07/1971Opinion issued
05/18/1971Response to Brief filed
05/07/1971Post submission brief filed
01/29/1971Response to Petition
01/14/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/14/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hazel Veony Coleman, individually and as Next Friend of Allen Scout Coleman, a Minor, and as Community Survivor of Mike Coleman, deceasedRespondent
Fletcher Rabb, individually and dba Vapo Gas and Appliance Company and Lex TrexlerPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information