judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

J. W. TRAMMELL v. JACK WHITLOCK, ET UX.

Case: A-3157
A-3157
04/19/1951
Application for Writ of Error
J. W. TRAMMELL
JACK WHITLOCK, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/04/1951Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
08/03/1951Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/10/1951Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
06/27/1951Brief on the MeritsRespondent
04/25/1951Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/24/1951Response to PetitionRespondent
04/19/1951Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/04/1951Brief in Support of Petition
08/08/1951Letter Filed
08/03/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/25/1951Opinion issued
07/10/1951Supplemental Brief filed
06/27/1951Brief on the Merits
05/14/1951Motion to re-set submission date filed.Filing granted
05/09/1951Document received (See Remarks)
05/09/1951Document received (See Remarks)
04/25/1951Reply to Response
04/24/1951Response to Petition
04/19/1951Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/19/1951Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. W. TrammellPetitioner
Jack Whitlock, et ux.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information