judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LANDROM (JIMMY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34884
Short Caption:LANDROM (JIMMY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C154130Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-09182
10/08/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. October 10, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Joseph A. D'Amato. 99-09752
10/21/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-10263
10/21/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-10264
11/10/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-11083
12/06/1999Order/Procedural Order. Counsel for appellant shall file a rough draft transcript request in the district court within 5 days of the date of this order. Upon filing of the request in district court, counsel for appellant shall forward a copy of the request to this court. Failure to comply may subject counsel to sanctions. 99-12128
02/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court again orders that counsel for appellant, within 20 days of the date of this order, shall file a request for a rough draft transcript of the December 14, 1998, sentencing hearing in the disstrict court. Upon the filing of the request in district court, appellant shall immediately forward a copy of the request to this court. In addition, counsel for appellant shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, show cause why this court should not impose sanctions for counsel's failure to comply with this court's orders. 00-03045
03/06/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 12/14/98 Court Reporter: Joe D'Amato Filed in district on: February 28, 2000. 00-03538
04/10/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. To date counsel has failed to show cause why he should not be santioned for his failure to comply with the provisions of NRAP 3C and the directives of this court. We conclude that the imposition of a monetary sanction is appropriate. Accordingly, counsel for appellant shall personally pay the sum of $100.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide the clerk of this court with proof of said payment with 20 days of the date of this order. Counsel is cautioned that continued failure to comply with the orders of this court will result in the imposition of further sanctions. 00-05641
04/21/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Reconsider Sanctions. 00-06402
04/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Court Reporter Joe D'Amato shall deliver a copy of the requested transcript to the clerk of this court within 10 days from the date of this order or show cause why he should not be sanctioned. 00-06920
05/11/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. On April 21, 2000, Jorgensen filed a motion for reconsideration of sanctions. We conclude that no good cause has been shown for this court to reconsider the sanctions. Jorgensen shall personally pay to the Supreme Court Law Library the $100.00 previously ordered and provide the clerk of this court with proof of said payment within 15 days of this order. 00-07799
06/06/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Proof of payment of sanctions from attorney Craig Jorgenson 00-09538
07/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no transcript has been provided to this court and there has been no attempt to show cause for the failure to comply with NRAP 3C(d)(3)(iii). We order court reporter Joe D'Amato to pay sanctions in the amount of $100 to the Nevada Supreme Court Law Library and to provide proof of that payment to the clerk of this court within 15 days of the date of this order. Moreover, court reporter Joe D'Amato shall provide the requested transcripts to this court within 10 days from the date of this order or show cause why he should not be sanctioned further. 00-11658
07/21/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 12/14/98; 08/26/99; and 10/20/99. Court Reporter: Joseph A. D'Amato. 00-12629
09/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. We conclude that the prosecutor violated the plea agreement. " . . . we remand this matter to the district court with instructions to vacate appellant's sentence and hold a new sentencing hearing before a different district court judge." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-16092
10/10/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-16203
10/10/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 18, 2000. 00-16203