judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANN T. DWAN v. INDIAN SPRINGS RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., a Wyoming nonprofit corporation

Case Heading (S-09-0064)
Case Number:S-09-0064Case Docketed On:03/30/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:ANN T. DWAN v. INDIAN SPRINGS RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., a Wyoming nonprofit corporation
Full Title:ANN T. DWAN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. INDIAN SPRINGS RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., a Wyoming nonprofit corporation, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAnn T. DwanDavid G. Lewis
AppelleeIndian Springs Ranch Homeowners Association, Inc.Edward Frank Hess
Heather Noble

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees, Property -Servitudes
Opinion Number:2010 WY 72
Citation:232 P.3d 1183

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/30/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/30/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/30/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/18/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/19/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/24/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/10/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/13/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/23/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Exhibits & Attachments.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/04/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/10/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Edward Hess for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David Lewis for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/22/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David G. Lewis for appellant; Edward F. Hess for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/22/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/03/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/21/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/21/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/28/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/24/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal