judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-94-00131-CR
13-94-00131-CR
03/14/1994
Burglary
Pena, Roland
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/1996Letter sent
02/06/1995Letter filed
12/22/1994Motion for leave to file brief DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Denied
12/12/1994Motion for leave to file brief
09/19/1994Mandate Issued
08/15/1994Insert page ___ to _______________
08/04/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/29/1994Submitted
07/29/1994Submission
06/30/1994Letter filed
05/31/1994Brief Filed
05/31/1994Case ready to be set
05/31/1994No oral argument requested
05/26/1994Motion for leave to file SOF DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
05/23/1994Affidavit Filed
05/17/1994request for documents
05/10/1994Green card in
05/04/1994Additional copies of Motion for Leave
05/04/1994Sworn Statement filed
04/28/1994STATEMENT OF FACTS FILED
04/28/1994Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
04/28/1994Statement of Facts Received
04/28/1994Motion for leave to file Statement of Facts
04/21/1994Letter sent to attorneys
04/14/1994Certified Copy Filed
04/04/1994Transcript Filed
03/14/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/14/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/19/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Pena, RolandAppellantEdward L. Joyal, Jr.
Roland Pena #689179
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasHon. James D. Rosenkild
Hon. Carlos Valdez
Trial Court Information
117th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Robert Blackmon
92-CR-2181-B
25 yrs. TDC