judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0285-94
PD-0285-94
03/14/1994
PDR Case Type
LEWIS, GIDGET
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/14/1994RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/16/1994FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
06/15/1994REHEAR DISPDENIED
06/15/1994REHEAR DISPDENIED
05/06/1994REHEAR FILED PDR
05/06/1994REHEAR FILED
04/20/1994PDR DISPRefused
04/20/1994PDR DISPRefused
03/14/1994PDR FILED
03/14/1994PDR FILED
03/14/1994RESPONSE FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/23/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn B. Holmes
LEWIS, GIDGETApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Robert J. Inger
Court of Appeals Information:
01-92-01102-CR
AFF 12-16-93
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
177th District Court
Harris
Honorable ROBERT E. MONTGOMERY
596340