judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EDMONDSON (JAMES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36359
Short Caption:EDMONDSON (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 42476
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C163740Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/07/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/29/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/29/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-11086
07/11/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-11885
07/11/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/31/00; 4/3/00; trial commencing 4/3/00 and ending 4/7/00; 5/25/00. To Court Reporter: Tina Smith. 00-11886
07/31/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 03/31/00; 04/03/00 (2); 04/04/00 (2); 04/05/00; 04/06/00; 04/07/00; and 05/25/00. Court Reporter: Tina Smith. 00-13176
10/23/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: 11/20/00. 00-18701
11/29/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-20847
12/04/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The motion filed November 29, 2000, is granted. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before December 20, 2000. 00-21062
01/09/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-00487
01/16/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received on January 9, 2001. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. 01-00831
01/16/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-no postmark. 01-00488
01/16/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 01-00489
02/20/2001MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 34 pages. 01-03135
02/20/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express Mail-no postmark. 01-03136
02/20/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 01-03138
03/14/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 17, 2001. 01-04556
06/11/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file a reply brief. Appellant's failure to file a reply brief is treated as a waiver of the right to file a reply brief. Briefing is deemed completed in this appeal. 01-09653
06/11/2001Case Status Update Briefing Completed.
11/07/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-18615
11/07/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML
02/08/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML. 02-02559
03/05/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-02737
03/05/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 7, 2002. 02-02737