judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FEZA MUHAMBO MALIKIDOGO V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 10-CT-1569
Short Caption:FEZA MUHAMBO MALIKIDOGO V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CTF17394-09Filed Date:12/14/2010

Opening Event Date:12/14/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/13/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantFeza Muhambo Malikidogo YPro SeN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Rosalyn Calbert GroceNY
Janice Y. SheppardNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/14/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/03/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Jeffrey Light, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
01/03/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Jeffrey Light, Esquire
01/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (8 pgs/Tape - 1/21/10 proc.)(w/CD)
01/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/05/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt already filed with court)dfe
01/07/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (CASTILLO)
01/10/2011RECORD INDEX
01/10/2011RECORD COPIES
02/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (40pgs/Tape) 1/21/10 proc. (Missing portion)
02/15/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/15/2011APPENDIX - attached to Appellant's Brief
03/21/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 7/25/11
03/28/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before July 25, 2011. (By: JAC)
07/25/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
08/18/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until September 28, 2011
09/28/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief - until October 5, 2011 (Aple)
10/05/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)
10/06/2011FiledTMC//APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEFING/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
12/22/2011FiledOrder Denying appellee's moitin for an extension of time as moot. (FIOBTE)
12/22/2011Filedorder granting motion for summary affirmance (FIOBTE)
12/22/2011FiledAffirmed
12/23/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
01/13/2012FiledMandate