judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-94-00041-CR
10-94-00041-CR
03/14/1994
Theft
R. D. Plunkett
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/27/1995Case stored
03/27/1995Mandate issued by this Court
03/09/1995Case returned from higher court
02/06/1995Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
10/28/1994Case forwarded to higher court
10/14/1994Petition for Discretionary Review filed
09/14/1994Motion for Rehearing filedMotion or Writ Denied
09/01/1994Motion for Rehearing filed
08/17/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/17/1994No Description Available.
05/04/1994Submitted
05/04/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/04/1994Submission
04/28/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
04/20/1994No Description Available.
04/06/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/06/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/01/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
04/01/1994No Description Available.
03/17/1994No Description Available.
03/17/1994No Description Available.
03/17/1994Submission
03/14/1994Notice of Appeal filed
03/14/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/27/2020Case StoredDestroy case in 25 years.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasHon. Thomas B. Sehon
Plunkett, R. D.AppellantJames H. Kreimeyer Jr.
Trial Court Information
82nd District Court
Robertson
Honorable W. T. McDonald
94-01-15,511-CR