judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00069-CV
02-94-00069-CV
03/14/1994
Other Personal Injury
Four Seasons Nursing Center, Inc.
Peabody, Joyce L.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
08/09/1994Mandate Issued
06/22/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/22/1994Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
05/26/1994Motion Filed
05/16/1994Exhibits Filed
05/16/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
05/16/1994No Description Available.
05/12/1994No Description Available.
04/28/1994Submission
04/19/1994Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed
04/18/1994No Description Available.
03/18/1994Request for Extension of Recorder's Record DisposdMotion or Writ Granted
03/17/1994No Description Available.
03/14/1994No Description Available.
03/14/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/17/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Robinson, Gina A.Appellant
Peabody, Joyce L.Appellee
Four Seasons Nursing Center, IAppellant
Manor Healthcare CorpAppellant
Trial Court Information
236th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Brent A. Carr
236-126466-90