judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RANDALL D. SCHREIBVOGEL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0044)
Case Number:S-09-0044Case Docketed On:03/05/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:RANDALL D. SCHREIBVOGEL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RANDALL D. SCHREIBVOGEL, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRandall D. SchreibvogelDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Evidence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 45
Citation:228 P.3d 874

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/05/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/05/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/20/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/21/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/21/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/08/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/20/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/21/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/04/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/06/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/06/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk Morgan for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/14/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/23/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk A. Morgan, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/23/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/16/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the Court, Chief Justice Voigt filed a specially concurring opinion.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/04/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/04/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/06/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/5/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal