judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TOMMY NGUYEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1568
Short Caption:TOMMY NGUYEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Sexual Solicitation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD16004-10Filed Date:12/13/2010

Opening Event Date:12/13/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/14/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTommy Nguyen YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/13/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/04/2011ORDERED: That appellant shall, within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, provide this court with the necessary documentation to support the appointment of counsel, or file a motion and fully completed financial information statement to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis pursuant to D.C. App. R. 24 (3). Failure to comply with this order may result in appellant being deemed as proceeding pro se. (By: JAC)
02/10/2011ORDERED, ss, that appellant shall proceed on appeal pro se. It is F/O that appellant shall w/n 20 days from the date of this order complete and file w/this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is F/O that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal w/o further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). ETW
03/10/2011ORDERED: That this apepal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
03/10/2011DISMISSED
11/14/2011FiledMandate