judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SELECTIVE INSURANCE CO. VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36358
Short Caption:SELECTIVE INSURANCE CO. VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34556
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A357833Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/18/2001 at 8:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/18/2001How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/29/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Law firm of Hale, Lane, Peek, Dennison, Howard & Anderson.
06/29/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
06/29/2000MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Temporary Stay. Filed via fax. 00-11085
06/29/2000ExhibitFiled Exhibits (copies). Exhibit 1: Motion to Quash filed in district court on January 28, 2000. 00-11113
06/29/2000MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Original of Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Temporary Stay. 00-11158
06/29/2000ExhibitFiled Exhibits (copies). Original of Exhibit 1 to Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Temporary Stay. 00-11159
06/30/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We have considered the motion, and we are not persuaded that a stay is warranted at this time. Petitioner has not first sought a stay in the district court and has not demonstrated that the pertinent factors militate in favor of a stay. Accordingly, we deny petitioner's motion. 00-11256
07/03/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Beckley Singleton Jemison Cobeaga & List--check no. 12690.
07/03/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 00-11328
07/03/2000MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Petitioner's Renewed Emergency Motion for Temporary Stay. 00-11329
07/05/2000Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. Affidavit of Amy N. Tirre. (Filed via fax--ok to file per AH.) 00-11398
07/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. As explained in our previous order, petitioner has not demonstrated that the considerations for granting a stay militate in petitioner's favor. We deny petitioner's "renewed" motion and caution counsel that additional serial motions raising identical arguments may subject counsel to sanctions. 00-11454
07/11/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due from the real parties in interest: 30 days from the date of this order. 00-11947
08/10/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Judy Prince's Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 00-13892
08/14/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Motion to Extend Time. 00-14168
08/17/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answer due from Real Party in Interest: September 7, 2000. 00-14386
09/11/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Judy Prince's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 00-15920
10/19/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on November 16, 2000 at 1:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. (SNP00A-1 - CY/RR/NB)
10/26/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Please add Dan Polsenberg to this courts docket. 00-18938
10/30/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Peter M. Angulo regarding oral argument scheduled for 11/16/00 at 1:30 p.m. 00-19046
11/01/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Removed Mark John Smith as a real party in interest; also removed Peter M. Angulo as counsel.
11/02/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
11/06/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to File Reply. 00-19479
11/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Cause appearing, we grant petitioner's motion to file a reply. Accordingly the clerk of this court shall forthwith file the reply appended to petitioner's motion as Exhibit A. Fn1[ We remind counsel for petitioner, for future reference, that a motion requesting permission to file a document should not include the proposed document. The document may, however, be submitted concurrently with but separately from the motion.] 00-19541
11/07/2000Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition.
11/15/2000MotionFiled Motion. Emergency Motion to Continue Oral Argument. (Filed - Via Fax 11/15/00). 00-20015
11/15/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from law firm of Pyatt & Silvestri, requesting that James Silvestri be substituted in place of Michael Keahey as counsel for Elayne Eiselman. 00-20034
11/15/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Vacating Argument and Setting for Submission. Order Continuing Oral Argument. We grant the motion filed by petitioner to continue oral argument. We vacate the oral argument presently scheduled for November 16, 2000, at 1:30 p.m. in Las Vegas, and direct the clerk of this court to reschedule this appeal for oral argument on January 18, 2001, in Carson City, before the Sourthern Nevada Panel. 00-20045
11/30/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on January 18, 2001 at 8:30 a.m. in Carson City. (SNP00A-1 - RR/WM/NB)
12/29/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
01/18/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before ths Southern Nevada Panel. SNP00A-1-RR/WM/NB.
04/06/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. Granting Petition for Writ of Prohibition. "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF PROHIBITION." fn6[Selective Insurance alternatively contends that the district court erred in concluding that Nevada's exercise of jurisdiction over it was reasonable and in allowing Judy Prince to amend her original complaint to include claims against Selective Insurance. Because we conclude that the district court did not have personal jurisdiction over Selective Insurance due to its insufficient contacts with Nevada, we need not address these alternative arguments.] SNP00A-1-WM/RR/NB 01-05894
04/06/2001WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Amy N. Tirre for service upon Judge James C. Mahan. 01-05942
04/12/2001WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge James C. Mahan on April 11, 2001. 01-05942
04/26/2001Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: 4/24/01- Las Vegas Drop Off. 01-07067
04/26/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
04/27/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. $100.00 for Rehearing. Due Date: 10 days.
04/27/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. District Court Judge Mahan. Due date: 5 days.
05/04/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. --Amended Certificate of Service of Petition for Rehearing. (Served on Dan Polsenberg and Jim Silvestri.) 01-07490
05/07/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Martin & Allison-check no. 2119.
05/17/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. on Honorable Judge James C. Mahan. 01-08195
09/14/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Martin & Allison. 01-15592
11/08/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." SNP00A-WM/RR/NB 01-18654
11/27/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-19812
11/27/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.