judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00586-CV
05-94-00586-CV
04/14/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Sanford, Robert R.
Anderson, Betty
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/13/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
05/13/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
05/06/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Denied
05/02/1994MattConv
05/02/1994Statement of Facts Filed
04/20/1994Response to Motion
04/19/1994MattConv
04/19/1994Supplemental Transcript filed
04/19/1994Transcript Filed
04/18/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/14/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/07/1994Appeal Bond Filed
03/21/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/13/1994Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1
Grayson
94-1-041P