judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-94-00187-CR
06-94-00187-CR
04/14/1994
Assault or Attempted Murder
Alexander, Marcus
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/21/1994Mandate Issued
11/03/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/30/1994No Statement of Facts has been filed
08/08/1994No Statement of Facts has been filed
05/31/1994Transcript Filed
04/14/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/08/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/21/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Alexander, MarcusAppellantHon. Brady Fisher
Trial Court Information
County Court
Lamar
Honorable Deane A. Loughmiller
29526
$2000 + ct costs, 365 days