judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00209-CR
04-94-00209-CR
04/14/1994
All Misdemeanors
Cabrera, Romeo
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/22/1995Mandate Issued
09/22/1995Mandate Issued
07/26/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/26/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/06/1995Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/03/1995Motion Filed
06/02/1995Submission
09/19/1994Case ready to be set
09/19/1994Brief Filed
09/19/1994Case ready to be set
08/23/1994Brief Filed
07/14/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
07/05/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/19/1994No Description Available.
04/21/1994Order Entered
04/14/1994No Description Available.
04/14/1994No Description Available.
04/14/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/05/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/30/1994Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/17/2013Case StoredCase stored
09/22/2020RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Cabrera, RomeoCriminal - AppellantSheryll S. Dempsey
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasJerry Don Evans
Trial Court Information
County Court
Uvalde
93-21896
180 days jail probated for