judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-94-00100-CV
12-94-00100-CV
04/14/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Tanner, Hattie M.
East Texas Mental Health, Inc., The Andrews Center f/k/a, Mental Health Mental Retardation Center of East Texas, and Mental Health Mental Retardation Regional Center of East Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/18/2006Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
03/02/1995Case stored
03/01/1995
02/27/1995Mandate Issued
02/09/1995
01/10/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/23/1994Letter from the Court
08/09/1994motion for rehearing filed
07/26/1994Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
07/26/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/21/1994Submitted
07/21/1994Submission
06/30/1994
06/30/1994Submission
06/09/1994
05/27/1994Brief Filed
05/27/1994Case ready to be set
05/06/1994Brief Filed
04/14/1994No Description Available.
04/14/1994No Description Available.
04/14/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/07/1994Surety Bond Filed
03/08/1994Order Entered
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/11/1980Case DestroyedCase Destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tanner, Hattie M.AppellantMr. Michael G. Carroll
East Texas Mental Health, Inc.AppelleeMs. Lindsey S. Birdsong
Mr. Michael J. McNally
Trial Court Information
241st District Court
Smith
Honorable John Winship Mitchell
91-1473-C