judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 11-94-00051-CR
11-94-00051-CR
04/14/1994
Sexual Assault
Mayse, James Thomas
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/06/1995Mandate issued
12/31/1994Yearly opinion book
12/08/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/01/1994Submitted
12/01/1994Submission set in Eastland
11/17/1994Submission set in Eastland
10/03/1994Brief filed
09/08/1994Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/06/1994Mot. - Ext. to file brief
08/03/1994Exhibits filed
08/03/1994SF filed
06/30/1994Mot. - Ext. time to file SF disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/24/1994Mot. - Ext. time to file SF
05/12/1994Mot. - To file disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/12/1994TR filed
05/06/1994Mot. - For leave/permission to file late article
05/02/1994TR received
04/28/1994Inquiring on status, etc. of case
04/28/1994Mot. - Ext. time to file SF disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/22/1994Mot. - Ext. time to file SF
04/14/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/25/1994Judgment of trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/06/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasErnie Armstrong, Judge
Mayse, JamesCriminal - AppellantCraig F. Kulhanek
Merrilie W. Maull
David Stiles
Trial Court Information
132nd District Court
Scurry
Honorable Gene L Dulaney, Senior Judge
6567
60 Years