judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00131-CR
02-94-00131-CR
04/14/1994
Burglary
Hall, Jeffrey Wayne
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/19/1994Mandate Issued
07/19/1994Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/19/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
07/08/1994Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed
05/25/1994Submission
05/16/1994No Description Available.
05/13/1994No Description Available.
04/14/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/14/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/19/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of Texas
Hall, Jeffrey W.Criminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
367th District Court
Denton
Honorable E. Lee Gabriel
F-90-906-E
10 yrs IDTDCJ