judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00358-CR
01-94-00358-CR
04/14/1994
Assault & battery
Sheridan, Michael Henry
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/03/1995Mandate issued
12/22/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
12/22/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
12/05/1994Motion to dismiss appeal
11/17/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/27/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/06/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/29/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/08/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/29/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/04/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/25/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/29/1994Statement of facts filed
05/19/1994Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
05/10/1994Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
04/14/1994Transcript filed
04/14/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/03/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantAlvin Saenz
StateCriminal - State of TexasMichael J. Guarino
Trial Court Information
56th District Court
Galveston
Honorable ISRAEL LERNER
93CR1507
20 yrs tdc