judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00357-CR
01-94-00357-CR
04/14/1994
Other Drug Possession
Solorio, Raul
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/03/1995Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/03/1995Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/10/1995Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
09/13/1995Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
05/23/1995Case file received by higher Court or agency.
05/22/1995Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
05/08/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
04/21/1995Motion for rehearing was not filed
04/06/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/06/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/14/1995Submitted
02/14/1995Submission
02/14/1995Submitted
01/19/1995Reset submission date
12/01/1994Submission
11/07/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
11/07/1994Case ready to be set
11/07/1994Case ready to be set
10/20/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
10/20/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/12/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/08/1994Statement of facts filed
07/28/1994Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
07/20/1994Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
07/14/1994Transcript filed
04/14/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/11/1994Notice of appeal filed
03/16/1994Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/03/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
TEXAS, THE STATE OFCriminal - State of TexasAlan Curry
John B. Holmes
SOLORIO, RAULCriminal - AppellantJames R. Walker, Jr.
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
Honorable WILLIAM HATTEN
655,146
17 yrs tdc & 15,000 fine