judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: WR-10,978-05
WR-10,978-05
04/15/1994
1107-HC
KOSSIE, LEXTER KENNON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/09/2017MISC DOCUMENT RECD
04/29/2015MISC DOCUMENT RECD
11/02/2012STATUS (INMATE CORRES)HC relief denied WITHOUT written order.
05/11/1994ACTION TAKENHC relief denied WITHOUT written order.
04/15/1994WRIT RECEIVED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/11/1994STOREDWRIT STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
KOSSIE, LEXTER KENNONApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)
Court of Appeals Information:
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
306767-E