judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

OPPORTUNITY KNOCKS ENTERPRISES, LLC v. SHANNON ELECTRIC, INC.

Case Heading (S-09-0079)
Case Number:S-09-0079Case Docketed On:04/16/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Liens (Title 29)
Short Title:OPPORTUNITY KNOCKS ENTERPRISES, LLC v. SHANNON ELECTRIC, INC.
Full Title:OPPORTUNITY KNOCKS ENTERPRISES, LLC., Appellant (Plaintiff), v. SHANNON ELECTRIC, INC., Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantOpportunity Knocks Enterprises, LLCGalen Bruce Woelk
Alan Gregory Harding
AppelleeShannon Electric, Inc.Peggy Ann Trent
Kristin Shaun Wilkerson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Liens, Property
Opinion Number:2010 WY 99
Citation:236 P.3d 255

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/16/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/16/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/16/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
06/03/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Brief and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/17/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/20/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee, Shannon Electric, Inc.; and received copy of appellee's designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/22/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (Appellee's amended)Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
08/04/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/04/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/05/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/10/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Alan G. Harding for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/11/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kristin Shaun Wilkerson for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/12/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/12/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript; Volume III, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/24/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Galen Bruce Woelk and Alan G. Harding, argument by Mr. Harding for appellant; Peggy Ann Trent and Kristin Shaun Wilkerson, argument by Ms. Wilkerson for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/25/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/14/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/30/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/30/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/30/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/30/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/04/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/2/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal