judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARVIN RICH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1619
Short Caption:MARVIN RICH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM1906-09Filed Date:12/22/2010

Opening Event Date:12/22/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/11/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/20/2012
Argued/Submitted:04/12/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/21/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMarvin A. Rich Y
Cedric D. MillerYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Erik KenersonYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/22/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/10/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Cedric Miller, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
01/10/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Cedric Miller, Esquire
01/28/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (53pgs/Graybill) 8/12/10 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (101pgs/Janifer) 9/20/10 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (116pgs/Richer for Hill) 9/29/10 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (120pgs/Pirfo) 10/7/10 proc.
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (22pgs/Peterson-Hart) 10/18/10 proc. (Morning)
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (90pgs/Ransom-Jones) 10/18/10 proc. (Afternoon)
04/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (19pgs/Tape) 12/6/10 proc. w/CD
04/11/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/14/2011RECORD INDEX
04/14/2011RECORD COPIES
05/24/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until July 8, 2011 (no oppo)
06/09/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 8, 2011. (By: JAC)
07/08/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 9/12/11
07/21/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief
09/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - for 45 days (Appellant)Granted
09/28/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until October 27, 2011
10/27/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/17/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/07/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motions for extensions of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before December 19, 2011
12/19/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
12/19/2011FiledAppendix (attached to Appellant's Brief) (Appellant)
01/20/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
01/20/2012FiledBriefing Completed
02/15/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/12/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Ferren, Washington
07/30/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge, and Ferren, Senior Judge)
08/21/2012FiledMandate