judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00126-CR
02-94-00126-CR
04/14/1994
Assault or Attempted Murder
Meeks, Johnny Fain
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/19/1995Mandate Issued
05/04/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/10/1995Submitted
01/10/1995Submission
12/22/1994Order Entered
11/07/1994Brief Filed
11/07/1994Case ready to be set
10/03/1994Brief Filed
08/11/1994Submission
08/10/1994No Description Available.
07/13/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
07/11/1994No Description Available.
05/13/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
05/12/1994No Description Available.
05/10/1994No Description Available.
04/14/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/14/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/19/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Meeks, Johnny FainCriminal - AppellantWilliam K. Clary
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasBarry Green
Trial Court Information
271st District Court
Jack
Honorable John G Street
3490
25 yrs IDTDCJ