judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6431
A-6431
06/28/1957
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY
A. L. JEZEK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/16/1957Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/17/1957Response to Reply filedRespondent
08/14/1957Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/08/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
06/28/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/18/1957Response to Motion filed
10/16/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/17/1957Response to Reply filed
08/14/1957Reply to Response
07/08/1957Response to Petition
06/28/1957Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/28/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
A. L. JezekRespondent
TEXAS POWER AND LIGHT COMPANYPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information