judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6427
A-6427
06/26/1957
Application for Writ of Error
EDWARDS FEED MILL, INC.
WILLIAM WARREN JOHNSON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/06/1958Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/14/1957Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
07/16/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
06/26/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/12/1958Response to Motion filed
03/06/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/19/1958Opinion issued
10/14/1957Brief on the Merits
10/02/1957Document received (See Remarks)
07/16/1957Response to Petition
06/26/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
William Warren JohnsonRespondent
Edwards Feed Mill, Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information