judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6446
A-6446
07/03/1957
Application for Writ of Error
SEARS, ROEBUCK AND CO., ET AL.
SAM S. JONES
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/16/1957Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/29/1957Response to PetitionPetitioner
07/12/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
07/05/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
07/03/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/24/1957Response to Motion filed
10/16/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/29/1957Response to Petition
07/12/1957Response to Petition
07/08/1957Document received (See Remarks)
07/05/1957Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/03/1957Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sam S. JonesRespondent
Sears, Roebuck and Co., et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information