judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6442
A-6442
07/03/1957
Application for Writ of Error
LORRAINE C. REED
DAVID G. REED
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/22/1958Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/09/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
07/03/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/27/1958Response to Motion filed
01/22/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/08/1958Dissenting opinion issued.
01/08/1958Opinion issued
10/02/1957Document received (See Remarks)
10/02/1957Document received (See Remarks)
07/09/1957Response to Petition
07/03/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
David G. ReedRespondent
Lorraine C. ReedPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information