Case Information: 65414 | |||
Short Caption: | DIAL (CEDRIC) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 71394 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - PC7113A | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/14/2014 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
04/14/2014 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 14-11895 | |
05/13/2014 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeals. "ORDER these appeals DISMISSED." Nos. 65413/65414/65415/65416. SNP14-JH/MD/MC. | 14-15602 | |
06/12/2014 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 14-19244 | |
06/12/2014 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
06/24/2014 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 16, 2014. | 14-19244 |