judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6471
A-6471
07/19/1957
Application for Writ of Error
J. G. ADKINS, ET AL.
J. PAUL ROGERS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/11/1957Response to Brief filedRespondent
11/08/1957Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
10/26/1957Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/23/1957Response to Brief filedRespondent
09/14/1957Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
08/31/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
07/19/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/11/1957Response to Brief filed
11/08/1957Brief in Support of Petition
11/01/1957Response to Motion filed
10/26/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/23/1957Response to Brief filed
09/14/1957Brief in Support of Petition
08/31/1957Response to Petition
07/19/1957Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/19/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. Paul Rogers, et al.Respondent
J. G. Adkins, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information